3 (31/112) |
2011-02-16 |
Team was assigned to a manager - Nikolai Simeonov |
3 (54/112) |
2011-03-11 |
Team folded - Nikolai Simeonov |
3 (54/112) |
2011-03-11 |
Team was assigned to a manager - ba4ekike |
3 (77/112) |
2011-04-03 |
Team folded - ba4ekike |
3 (78/112) |
2011-04-04 |
Team was assigned to a manager - pi4a43 |
3 (101/112) |
2011-04-27 |
Team folded - pi4a43 |
3 (102/112) |
2011-04-28 |
Team was assigned to a manager - Dimitar Ivanov |
4 (14/112) |
2011-05-22 |
Team folded - Dimitar Ivanov |
4 (14/112) |
2011-05-22 |
Team was assigned to a manager - vasko 009 |
4 (37/112) |
2011-06-14 |
Team folded - vasko 009 |
4 (39/112) |
2011-06-16 |
Team was assigned to a manager - desi87 |
4 (62/112) |
2011-07-09 |
Team folded - desi87 |
4 (64/112) |
2011-07-11 |
Team was assigned to a manager - cesekar |
4 (87/112) |
2011-08-03 |
Team folded - cesekar |
4 (88/112) |
2011-08-04 |
Team was assigned to a manager - Luciferr |
6 (93/112) |
2012-03-20 |
Team folded - Luciferr |